Financial history CROSSWAYS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 274379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/04/2020 18/04/2021 18/04/2022 18/04/2023 18/04/2024
Total gross income £7.59k £11.50k £2.08k £6.62k £12.33k
Total expenditure £9.64k £7.69k £1.34k £5.16k £14.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A