CONFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer Village Hall facilities to users in the North East Hampshire area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ronald John Griffin | Chair | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Newte Hardie | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Francis Hawes | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Ellen Macgill | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ruth White | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSS JONES | Trustee | 12 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE JANE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY PARRY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.70k | £3.52k | £2.94k | £6.26k | £5.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.73k | £4.41k | £9.14k | £5.46k | £8.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JULY 1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BRAMSHOTT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDNG USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAMSHOTT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Green View
Conford
LIPHOOK
Hampshire
GU30 7QJ
- Phone:
- 07813016061
- Email:
- Pward573@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window