R A AND V B REEKIE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities are to make charitable grants with an interest in Wiltshire based charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 October 1977: Standard registration
- 16 July 2019: Funds received from 231859 CHRISTOPHER CADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIRGINIA BRIDGET REEKIE | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicola Alison Louise McKittrick | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
ANDREW REEKIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN ALISTAIR JAMES REEKIE CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.26k | £38.61k | £41.26k | £48.28k | £47.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.69k | £45.03k | £37.99k | £37.91k | £43.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 18TH JULY 1977
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITALE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES THEREOF OR TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
B D O Llp
Two Snowhill
Snow Hill Queensway
BIRMINGHAM
B4 6GA
- Phone:
- 01212657288
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window