THE CHEATLE TRUST

Charity number: 274391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust was formed in September 1977 for the purposes of advancing Christianity in such manner as the Trustees shall determine. The Trustees may:- a) support and maintain any person or persons involved solely in advancing the objects of the Trust b) procure to be written print publish issue or record material c) assist any registered charity financially or otherwise

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £32,269
Total expenditure: £43,494

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Ralph Collins Chair 12 November 1977
NADEZHDA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, HARBORNE
Received: On time
Benjamin Ralph Collins Trustee 23 November 2015
THE GEORGE HENRY COLLINS CHARITY
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM SCHOOLS CONNECTION
Recently registered
Rev ADELE PATRICIA CHEATLE Trustee 23 June 1986
None on record
FIONA MARY COLLINS Trustee 10 September 1982
None on record
JOHN EDWARD CHEATLE Trustee 12 November 1977
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.23k £4.26k £56.07k £21.37k £32.27k
Total expenditure £5.47k £6.25k £28.32k £28.18k £43.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 May 2024 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 13 March 2023 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 OAKHAM ROAD
HARBORNE
BIRMINGHAM
B17 9DG
Phone:
01214275362
Website:

No information available