Trustees FRIENDS OF BRISTOL CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 274399

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rachel Barrett | Chair | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penelope Elaine Starns | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penny Parsons | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Hibbert | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Anne Morris | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Helen Taylor | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Myfanwy Opie | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Morris | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barrett | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.