Trustees BALSHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 274414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne-Marie Louise Soeiro Elsley Trustee 26 January 2020
None on record
Ian Clive Elsley Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Angelica Stokes Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
David Weir Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
CHARLES TALLACK Trustee 08 January 2014
None on record
JULIET BEVAN Trustee 03 January 2014
None on record
PAUL CARTER Trustee 25 November 2011
None on record
DEBBIE MOWER Trustee
None on record