HORNSEY HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging and enabling local history research in Hornsey parish, part of Haringey. Publishing original research for educational use, an annual bulletin and four newsletters for members.Sales of publications to general public. Talks to local schools and community organisations. Acquisition and preservation of archive material and advice to general public on local history issues. Monthly lectures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Haringey
Governance
- 11 October 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabel Hesse | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Lucy Peters | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
WALTER MERRICKS CBE | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.22k | £14.22k | £15.18k | £45.44k | £13.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.52k | £14.52k | £12.37k | £21.65k | £13.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH MAY 1971 AS AMENDED 31ST MAY 1972, 4TH APRIL 1973, 20TH FEBRUARY 1974, 7TH JULY 1976, 3RD JULY 1982, 10TH JULY 1985, 10 SEPTEMBER 1986, 14TH JULY 1993 AND 12TH JANUARY 2000 as amended on 11 Jul 2024 as amended on 01 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Society are to discover, preserve, promote and disseminate for the benefit of the public local history studies, conservation work and archaeological research relating to the ancient ecclesiastical and civil parish of Hornsey, (including Hornsey Village, Alexandra Park, Highgate, Crouch End, Muswell Hill, Wood Green, Bounds Green, Stroud Green, Harringay, Brownswood Manor and Colney Hatch), by means of lectures, publications, exhibitions, visits, research, the maintenance of an archive, and by such other means as the Trustees shall decide.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL AND CIVIL PARISH OF HORNSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORNSEY HISTORICAL SOCIETY
THE OLD SCHOOL HOUSE
136 TOTTENHAM LANE
LONDON
N8 7EL
- Phone:
- 02083488429
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window