PORTSMOUTH YOUTH ACTIVITIES COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help young people,especially but not exclusively through leisure time activities,to develop their physical,mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society. To enable disabled and the elderly in providing a range of enjoyable pursuits for their sporting and leisure needs. To undertake a programme of restoration at the Forts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 24 October 1977: Standard registration
- 23 October 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1162650 THE PETER ASHLEY ACTIVITY CENTRES
- PETER ASHLEY ACTIVITY CENTRES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £556.59k | £543.96k | £586.62k | £650.08k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £522.70k | £536.91k | £538.01k | £674.40k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £7.20k | £8.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.38k | £18.60k | £9.72k | £9.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £235.95k | £235.07k | £258.71k | £253.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £288.67k | £289.21k | £317.54k | £386.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £595 | £1.09k | £649 | £89 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £340.65k | £333.29k | £331.28k | £403.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £271.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.32k | £1.38k | £1.44k | £1.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 06 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
22 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/09/1977 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/1980 AS AMENDED ON 24/02/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window