CHESHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The focal point for the local community. We offer various educational, recreational and social activities. A home for over 40 clubs and associations who meet a on regular basis. Main Hall with licensed Bar available for hire, for weddings,parties and meetings.We have 2 registered charities renting office space within the Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 November 1977: Standard registration
- 20 December 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1168816 CHESHAM & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- THE WHITE HILL CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.89k | £99.81k | £104.31k | £126.27k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.17k | £103.18k | £105.48k | £102.72k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 08 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 08 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHESHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. SEE CLAUSE 2(B) FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
CHESHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window