Accounts and annual returns NORTHAMPTON AMATEUR OPERATIC COMPANY

Charity number: 274432
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 27 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 29 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 05 June 2013 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 05 June 2013 125 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 15 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 10 January 2012 On Time