THE CRANHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running the Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 November 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA CLAPTON | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH QUILTER DARROCH | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GORDON ROBERT SOUTAR | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Monro | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chloe McCarthy | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Emma Charlotte Tatham | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|||||
BERYL BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH LEGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR NIGEL COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA BOURNE-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.02k | £1.96k | £8.51k | £10.19k | £9.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.26k | £5.34k | £6.09k | £16.18k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 2ND JUNE 1977
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF VILLAGE HALL FOR THE PARISH INHABITANTS FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHR OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
THE CIVIL PARISH OF CRANHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOX COTTAGE
THE KNOLL
CRANHAM
GLOUCESTER
GL4 8HR
- Phone:
- 01452812056
- Email:
- emmatatham@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window