Financial history HEMSBY INSHORE RESCUE SERVICE

Charity number: 274451
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £147.29k £109.12k £184.32k £189.72k £171.59k
Total expenditure £87.20k £51.16k £119.92k £137.60k £131.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.10k
Income from government grants N/A £19.99k £28.26k £9.85k N/A