Trustees HEMSBY INSHORE RESCUE SERVICE
Charity number: 274451

Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAURICE WATTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kevin John Fenn Fenn | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Litten | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones John | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Hurd | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Batten | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Deeks | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.