ACTIONAID

Charity Number: 274467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ActionAid UK is part of an international federation working in 44 countries. We provide support and humanitarian assistance to people living in poverty and on the margins of survival. Together we demand action at local, national and international level. We don't walk away until we've achieved lasting change.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Islington
  • Somerset
  • Afghanistan
  • Australia
  • Bangladesh
  • Belgium
  • Brazil
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Denmark
  • Ecuador
  • Ethiopia
  • France
  • Ghana
  • Greece
  • Guatemala
  • Haiti
  • India
  • Ireland
  • Jordan
  • Kenya
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Malawi
  • Mozambique
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • Nigeria
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Rwanda
  • Senegal
  • Sierra Leone
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • Sweden
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Gambia
  • Tunisia
  • Uganda
  • United States
  • Vanuatu
  • Vietnam
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 1972: Standard registration
  • 06 January 2021: Funds received from 1111400 LINKING ARMS WITH RESCUED KIDS
  • 12 February 2025: Funds received from 238259 CRITCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ACTIONAID INTERNATIONAL UK (Working name)
  • ACTIONAID UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EUNICE RHODAH MUSIIME Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Hemansu Roy Trivedy Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Ruchi Tripathi Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
Faraz Tasnim Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Stella Eze Ngozi Abani Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Fikerte Woldegiorgis Atreso Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Anne Catherine Tutt Trustee 16 September 2022
SWANSEA UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
PANCREATIC CANCER UK
Received: On time
KATHARINE HOUSE HOSPICE TRUST
Received: On time
Abdulrahman Shiil Trustee 24 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £49.11m £50.31m £49.55m £59.64m £53.30m
Total expenditure £50.58m £49.13m £47.58m £58.06m £54.67m
Income from government contracts N/A £2.27k £235.06k £590.48k £1.62m
Income from government grants £1.09m £1.19m £1.29m £184.09k £645.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £38.61m £39.25m £41.67m £50.38m £41.77m
Income - Other trading activities £3.31m £3.05m £311.13k £331.62k £433.79k
Income - Charitable activities £7.10m £7.60m £7.48m £8.89m £10.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.00k £95.34k £38.21k £33.14k £247.30k
Income - Other £0 £316.20k £57.46k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.28m £3.72m £3.21m £2.81m £3.30m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £39.28m £37.44m £35.64m £46.00m £44.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.30m £11.69m £11.94m £12.06m £10.44m
Expenditure - Governance £453.00k £141.70k £162.09k £251.53k £203.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £31.72m £30.29m £28.44m £38.25m £36.32m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £439.00k £348.92k £346.46k £1.44m £2.20m
Long-term investments £1 £1 £0 £1 £1
Other assets £16.99m £17.29m £23.99m £21.22m £19.11m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.46m £2.40m £7.21m £3.90m £3.93m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 November 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 November 2022 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ACTIONAID
33-39 BOWLING GREEN LANE
LONDON
EC1R 0BJ
Phone:
01460238000