COVENT GARDEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Covent Garden Community Association is the active, representative voice of Covent Garden, speaking for the residents and working population in this busy area of Central London. It is the recognised amenity society, consulted by Camden and Westminster councils on planning and licensing applications, public realm, environmental issues, housing and community safety matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 28 October 1977: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 November 2011: Re-registered
- CGCA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Weir MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH BAX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Rigby | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £3.04k | £3.74k | £8.79k | £5.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.51k | £2.22k | £4.85k | £3.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED ON 27TH SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 7 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROTECT AND TO IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND QUALITY OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN, WORKING IN, OR VISITING THE AREA BOUNDED BY HIGH HOLBORN, NEW OXFORD STREET, CHARING CROSS ROAD, ST. MARTIN’S PLACE, NORTHUMBERLAND AVENUE, VICTORIA EMBANKMENT, LANCASTER PLACE, ALDWYCH AND KINGSWAY (‘THE COVENT GARDEN AREA’ OR ‘THE AREA’), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING: 1. CONDITIONS THAT SERVE TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE, INCLUDING THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF SUITABLE LAWS, REGULATIONS, LICENCES AND POLICIES; 2. HIGH STANDARDS OF: PLANNING, URBAN DESIGN, LANDSCAPING, INFRASTRUCTURE AND TRANSPORT; 3. CONSERVATION OF, CREATION OF, OR IMPROVEMENT TO: LANDS, BUILDINGS, OPEN SPACES, AMENITIES, FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR COMMUNITY INTEREST AND THE INDIVIDUAL CHARACTER OF AREA. 4. AVOIDANCE, REMOVAL, OR IMPROVEMENT OF: FEATURES THAT ARE UNSIGHTLY, UNHEALTHY OR, IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST, UNDESIRABLE; 5. A STABLE COMMUNITY, COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT AND THE CAPACITY TO EFFECT CHANGE; 6. A SENSE OF PUBLIC CONCERN FOR THE AREA; 7. THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT - BEING DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; 8. KNOWLEDGE OF AND INTEREST IN THESE MATTERS AMONGST PERSONS CONCERNED IN A PROFESSIONAL, LEGISLATIVE OR ADMINISTRATIVE CAPACITY AND AMONGST OTHER PERSONS OR CORPORATE BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Bedford Street
(2nd floor)
Covent Garden
London
WC2E 9HP
- Phone:
- 020 7836 5555
- Email:
- info@coventgarden.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window