THE FRIENDS OF CARDINAL NEWMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to disseminate knowledge of the teaching and philosophy of Saint John Henry Newman. to assist in collecting evidence of devotion to Newman for the furtherance of his cause as Doctor of the Church and to raise funds for popular publications, talks and audio-visual aids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 November 1977: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF CARDINAL NEWMAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ignatius Keith Harrison | Chair | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Beesley | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev DOUGLAS LAMB | Trustee | 30 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
BARBARA CAROLYN PARKINSON Miss | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
AMANDA MARY LUSCOMBE HILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.48k | £9.05k | £4.36k | £8.64k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.02k | £13.30k | £2.35k | £4.68k | £5.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 September 2020 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH JULY 1977
Charitable objects
DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE OF THE TEACHING AND PHILOSOPHY OF JOHN HENRY NEWMAN I) BY MEANS OF THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF ANY PUBLICATIONS DESIGNED TO INCREASE THE INFORMATION AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT HIM HIS TEACHING AND HIS PHILOSOPHY; AND II) BY ANY OTHER LAWFUL MEANS PAYING EXPENSES INCURRED IN CONNECTION WITH A MONTHLY MASS FOR THE GENERAL INTENTIONS OF THE SOCIETY AND THE INDIVIDUAL INTENTIONS OF ITS MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ORATORY
141 HAGLEY ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B16 8UE
- Phone:
- 01214540808
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window