Accounts and annual returns CLARENCE AND BESSIE FOWLER TRUST

Charity number: 274484
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 May 2007 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 11 August 2005 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required