WHITTLESEA MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A small social history museum displaying :- Agricultural tools Brickyard information and a collection of bricks Costumes Archaeology Toys History of local hero Sir Harry Smith A none working forge Church records/census and information Books Large collection of photos
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 November 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA SPEECHLEY | Chair | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Milne | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fleming | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Robshaw | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robshaw | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shearing | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Rawlings | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HANCOCK | Trustee | 10 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £4.90k | £4.07k | £5.55k | £5.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.99k | £5.52k | £5.35k | £6.87k | £5.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH MAY 1977
Charitable objects
A MUSEUM FOR THE DISPLAY OF ARTICLES OF AN HISTORICAL NATURE WHICH SPCIFICALLY RELATE TO THE HISTORY OF WHITTLESEA AND DISTRICT AND FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS AND LECTURES AND DEMONSTRATIONS WITH REFERENCE TO SUCH EXHIBITS.
Area of benefit
WHITTLESEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whittlesey Museum
18A Market Street
Whittlesey
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 1BD
- Phone:
- 01733203241
- Email:
- whittleseymuseum@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window