THE VIVIAN AND MARGARET STEINART CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees utilise the income from the Trust and occasionally capital to make grants and donations to various charitable causes known to the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 November 1977: Standard registration
- 09 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £1.41k | £1.09k | £1.77k | £1.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £540 | £5.66k | £760 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF ANY ONE OR MORE OF SUCH BODIES ASSOCIATIONS AND ORGANISATIONS AS SHALL AT THE DATE OF PAYMENT OR APPLICATION BE STABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window