DOWNTON BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brass Band and Youth Band
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 November 1977: Standard registration
- DOWNTON HUNTSMAN BAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Hunter-Plaskett | Chair | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Maria Dowling | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen White | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.68k | £20.79k | £22.75k | £14.19k | £20.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.91k | £8.19k | £12.39k | £18.06k | £16.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.80k | £18.66k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 December 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH OCTOBER 1977 AND AMENDED 16TH MAY 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF DOWNTON, WILTSHIRE AND TO FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC TASTE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
DOWNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Blackwater Grove
Alderholt
Fordingbridge
Hants
SP6 3AD
- Phone:
- 02380731331
- Email:
- secretary@downtonband.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window