THE WINGATE CHARITABLE TRUST FOR PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND REHABILITATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
training education and instruction in physiotherapy and the promotion of scientific research in and relating to all problems concerning physical education and the rehabilitation of the handicapped
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 16 November 1977: Standard registration
- 26 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WINGATE INSTITUTE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £0 | £287 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.73k | £0 | £312 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 12 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 20 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 27 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 09 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE ASSISTING IN AND PROMOTION OF THE CHARITABLE AIMS OBJECTS AND ACTIVITIES OF THE INSTITUTE AND THROUGH OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE INSTITUTE TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL SCIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WIHOUT PREJUDICE TO TH GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSIOTHERAPY AS A BRANCH THEREOF AND THE PROMOTION (BY ALL SUCH MEANS AS MAY BE CHARITABLE) OF METHODS TECHNIQUES AND TREATMENT IN OR TOWARDS THE REHABILITATION OF THE HANDICAPPED AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window