THE FRIENDS OF CHEAM CHURCH SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the work of the Church Schools in Cheam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sutton
Governance
- 25 November 1977: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 March 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Swain | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reverend Dr. Nicholas Peacock | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.98k | £9.86k | £9.62k | £1.38k | £4.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.81k | £30 | £29.36k | £255 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JULY 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND PARTICULARLY RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, AT THE SCHOOLS (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CHEAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Dunstans C Of E Primary School
Anne Boleyn's Walk
Cheam
SUTTON
Surrey
SM3 8DF
- Phone:
- 02086425463
- Email:
- stdunstans@suttonlea.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window