THE BADINGHAM COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organization and support of traditional country village activities for the benefit and enjoyment of local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 January 1978: Standard registration
- BCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Arthur Johnston | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Constance Cracknell | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Katharine Birtall | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Skinner | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Dicks | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SONJA RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Pauline Skevington | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.87k | £1.40k | £1.77k | £6.68k | £3.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £520 | £3.29k | £7.32k | £6.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1977 as amended on 28 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS. COMMUNTY CENTRES AND OTHERAMENITIES OF A SIMILAR CHARACTER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN BADIGHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH TH OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION,FUTHERING HEALTH,RELIEVING POVETRY,DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED IN LAW TO BE CHARTIABLE BY IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Area of benefit
BADINGHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fortuna House
Low Street
Badingham
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 8JS
- Phone:
- 01728638453
- Email:
- bill.badinghamcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window