POLDEN HILLS YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Rural Youth movement for young people aged 10-26 years. Members can gain confidence and train for skills in drama & entertainments, public speaking, all sports competitions, stockjudging, stock showing and dancing. Life skills are learnt from members running their own club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 December 1977: Standard registration
- POLDEN HILLS Y F C (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Dunster | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Beake | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Small | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cox | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.17k | £0 | £19.81k | £15.83k | £8.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.16k | £2.37k | £13.80k | £9.25k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 February 2025 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND (B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE, AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIENCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE - CHILTON POLDEN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
YFC OFFICE
THE OLD SCHOOL SCHOOL ROAD
WESTONZOYLAND
BRIDGWATER
SOMERSET
TA7 0LN
- Phone:
- 01278691711
- Email:
- admin@somersetyfc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window