STOKENCHURCH DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue, board and place stray and unwanted dogs in good homes. To continue to care for and protect dogs in need. In line with our non-destruct policy, we endeavour to save abandoned dogs from being put to sleep in the specified areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£770,755
Donations and legacies | £650.13k | |
Charitable activities | £54.59k | |
Other trading activities | £63.99k | |
Investments | £2.05k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£494,776
Raising funds | £7.51k | |
Charitable activities | £465.40k | |
Other | £21.87k |
-£1,890 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £29.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £465.40k | |
Retained for future use | £275.98k |
People

9 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 21 November 1977: Standard registration
- 03 March 2025: Funds received from 1188690 STOKENCHURCH DOG RESCUE CIO
- DOG RESCUE (Working name)
- DOG RESCUE STOKENCHURCH (Working name)
- DOG RESCUE AND WELFARE SOCIETY (HIGH WYCOMBE) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Peel | Chair | 11 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jo LLoyd | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Joanne Facey | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Patrick Dempsey | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucas Bergmans | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Alan Simms | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mark Biggs | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Gregory | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Gates | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Woodcock | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.52k | £264.92k | £367.20k | £482.89k | £770.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.95k | £278.42k | £331.27k | £206.06k | £494.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £650.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £63.99k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54.59k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.05k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £530.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £465.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £135.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.87k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £957.54k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £77.30k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £822.27k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 May 2022 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 May 2022 | 171 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1999 as amended on 14 Dec 2022 as amended on 09 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of stray and unwanted dogs in Buckinghamshire, Oxfordshire and Berkshire and surrounding areas in particular by: - providing and maintaining facilities for rescue, boarding and rehoming services for the reception, care and treatment of such animals. - promoting humane behaviour by providing appropriate, protection, treatment and security for such animals in need of care and attention due to sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances, or ill-usage. - educating the public on matters about animal welfare in general and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among such animals.
Area of benefit
HIGH WYCOMBE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tower Farm
Oxford Road
Stokenchurch
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP14 3TD
- Phone:
- 01494482695
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window