Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ST JOAN OF ARC SCHOOL
Charity number: 274595

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Champion | Chair | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Micheal WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Pomeroy | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Plummer | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Kennedy | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Lesley O'Reilly | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alessandra Elena Maria Arrigo | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly-Anne Jeffrey | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY DOYLE | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.