Financial history THE ORRIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 274599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £53.24k £43.57k £36.08k £50.13k £68.78k
Total expenditure £59.53k £8.00k £64.59k £9.65k £63.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A