JUBILEE COMMUNITY CHURCH (EAST GRINSTEAD) TRUST

Charity Number: 274617
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious and Community Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex
  • Pakistan
  • Romania
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 1978: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 09 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1153068 JUBILEE COMMUNITY CHURCH (EAST GRINSTEAD)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEW LIFE CHURCH (Working name)
  • NEW LIFE CHURCH (EAST GRINSTEAD) TRUST (Previous name)
  • WEST STREET EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 October 2021 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required