Accounts and annual returns SOLOMAN BALAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 274636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 May 2022 16 April 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required