FELIXSTOWE NURSERY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 274663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre-school education for children up to the age of 5.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £199,985
Total expenditure: £190,851

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NORSELAND SCHOOLS LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Caroline Fish Chair 01 February 2020
None on record
Christopher Daniel Ozanne Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Verena June Ozanne Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
John Antony Heathcock Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
John Heathcock Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
ROSE HEATHCOCK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £125.34k £162.11k £172.97k £150.56k £199.99k
Total expenditure £130.76k £132.93k £157.91k £160.04k £190.85k
Income from government contracts £114.44k N/A £158.28k £112.33k £171.80k
Income from government grants N/A £151.19k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 06 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
67 LINKS AVENUE
FELIXSTOWE
IP11 9HE
Phone:
01394671859