INTERNATIONAL GLAUCOMA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objectives are to help prevent glaucoma blindness and support people living with glaucoma. We: Provide information, advice and support through a telephone helpline and online forum. Publish a wide range of booklets and leaflets and distribute regular newsletters. Fund glaucoma research Run support groups, conferences & awareness raising activities for patients and professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£2,358,050
Donations and legacies | £1.79m | |
Charitable activities | £369.01k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £199.93k | |
Other | £1.19k |
Total expenditure:
£2,077,745
Raising funds | £293.18k | |
Charitable activities | £1.78m | |
Other | £0 |
£439,908 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £293.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m | |
Retained for future use | £280.31k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £293.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m | |
Retained for future use | £720.21k |
People

22 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 December 1977: Standard registration
- 05 September 2017: Funds received from 1123188 THE FUND FOR THE IGA CHAIR OF OPTHALMOLOGY FOR GLA...
- GLAUCOMA ASSOCIATION IGA (Working name)
- Glaucoma UK (Working name)
- I G A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prabhakar Sundaresan | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hunton | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Roshini Sanders | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cecilia Helen Fenerty | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Winifred Nolan | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Borsuk | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roxanne Crosby-Nwaobi | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Parkins | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony King | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Spendiff | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jay Epstein | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Yolanda Laybourne | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72m | £1.80m | £1.84m | £1.77m | £2.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09m | £1.04m | £1.48m | £1.75m | £2.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.37k | £62 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.47m | £1.63m | £1.67m | £1.48m | £1.79m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.10k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £72.65k | £61.31k | £19.13k | £105.32k | £369.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £123.62k | £98.51k | £144.75k | £181.74k | £199.93k | |
|
Income - Other | £123.05k | £4.59k | £6.56k | £2.18k | £1.19k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.23m | £1.41m | £1.49m | £1.21m | £1.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £930.57k | £904.91k | £1.34m | £1.53m | £1.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £160.42k | £137.75k | £142.34k | £221.44k | £293.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £38.22k | £46.40k | £82.31k | £54.50k | £46.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £95.25k | £110.43k | £364.95k | £408.66k | £363.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.92k | £24.23k | £15.03k | £18.14k | £12.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.86k | £15.89k | £16.14k | £3.21k | £806 | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.99m | £7.07m | £7.05m | £6.86m | £7.48m | |
|
Other assets | £1.88m | £1.54m | £1.56m | £2.09m | £2.25m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £353.24k | £338.64k | £466.95k | £902.09k | £961.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 JAN 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUN 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAR 2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08 MAR 2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 JUN 2024 as amended on 13 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO: HELP PRESERVE THE SIGHT OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY GLAUCOMA AND ALLIED CONDITIONS; ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, CARE AND TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA AND ALLIED CONDITIONS; RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF GLAUCOMA; AND PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE LIVING WITH GLAUCOMA AND THE PROFESSIONALS WHO SUPPORT THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodcote House
15 Highpoint Business Village
Henwood
Ashford
TN24 8DH
- Phone:
- 01233648164
- Email:
- info@glaucoma.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window