Accounts and annual returns LANDALE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 274722
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 17 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 19 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 23 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2007 16 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 16 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 17 January 2007 On Time