Financial history THE NYDA AND OLIVER PRENN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274726
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013
Total gross income £9.79k £6.65k £3.78k £2.79k £748
Total expenditure £40.22k £52.91k £83.96k £54.72k £54.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A