THE BARNET BOROUGH TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteers (nobody in BBTN is paid) assemble local news which is read into computer from which CDs are produced and despatched weekly free of charge to sight-impaired Barnet residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 12 January 1978: Standard registration
- BBTN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAFAR KHAN | Chair | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
David Cramer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £800 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 1983 AND 12 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND THOSE WHO BY REASON OF ANY VISUAL INCAPACITY, WHETHER TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT HAVE DIFFICULTY IN READING AND WHO IN ALL CASES RESIDE IN OR IN THE VICINITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.(2) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET AND IN OTHER AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE ASSOCIATION AND BY OTHER ASSOCIATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 GRASS PARK
LONDON
N3 1UB
- Phone:
- 02076363702
- Email:
- bbtn@talktalk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window