THE SCHOOL MATHEMATICS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works to improve the teaching and learning of mathematics in schools and colleges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 1978: Standard registration
- 02 August 2023: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £7.15k | £13.14k | £6.53k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £920 | £1.17k | £1.99k | £2.64k | £2.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF MATHEMATICS IN SCHOOLS IN GREAT BRITAIN AND OTHER COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window