KOKORO NO KAI INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Buddhist philosophy by example and encouragement both at the Centres and in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
- Lithuania
Governance
- 03 February 1978: Standard registration
- 06 December 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- REIYUKAI TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £4.25k | £2.19k | £2.43k | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.49k | £4.03k | £2.30k | £2.00k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 AUGUST 1977 AS AMENDED ON 12 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF BUDDHISM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES OF THE REIYUKAI AMONGST THE MEMBERS THEREOF OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF TEMPLES AND OTHER PLACES OF WORSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window