Trustees MUSICAL THEATRE SALISBURY
Charity number: 274782

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Stuart | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalya Vass | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
OWENA ARCHER | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Smith | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Harding | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Natasha Duffy | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Joanne Parrett | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter McAuley | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Foord | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brigitte Potts | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josh Bradley | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE BOWDEN | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
HON MARY MORRISON DCVO | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.