ANCHOR HALL TRUST

Charity number: 274797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide Grants for Boys' Brigade Companys in the Barnet Area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £143
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Graham Buey Mr Trustee 09 October 2020
None on record
Dr ALAN TIMOTHY RIDGE Trustee 16 July 2011
ENFIELD CENTRE FOR NATURAL HEALTH LIMITED
Received: On time
ALLAN DOWN Trustee
None on record
TONY ALDERMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £143 £129 £2 £16 £143
Total expenditure £0 £1.00k £325 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 NORTHBROOK ROAD
BARNET
EN5 2PA
Phone:
02084402915
Website:

No information available