Financial history APPLEDORE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 274808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £9.32k £22.12k £9.11k £8.31k £12.77k
Total expenditure £10.21k £4.10k £10.04k £22.74k £14.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £480
Income from government grants N/A £20.19k N/A N/A N/A