Trustees APPLEDORE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 274808

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arthur Derek Winter | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denise Georgina Stephens | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Thornton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ivan Kinsley | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Penelope Frances Ray | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joy Hiskey | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Self | Trustee | 09 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.