VIRGINIA WATER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education and provision of recreational leisure facilities for inhabitants of Virginia Water and neighbourhood. Management and maintenance of Community Centre in Beechmont Avenue, Virginia Water.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 February 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Rosalinda Springall | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Lesley Hodgson | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.84k | £33.34k | £30.45k | £35.20k | £34.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.18k | £16.13k | £40.97k | £30.83k | £29.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 171 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 January 2025 | 537 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 January 2025 | 537 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH JULY 1977 AS AMENDED ON 18TH MARCH 1996 AND 4 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: (A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF VIRGINIA WATER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR TOHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS INA COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT.
Area of benefit
VIRGINIA WATER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
VW Community Association
Beechmont Avenue
VIRGINIA WATER
Surrey
GU25 4EY
- Phone:
- 01344 842892
- Email:
- enquiries@vwca.org.uk
- Website:
-
vwca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window