Financial history WOKINGHAM CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 274853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.19k £22.08k £40.59k £47.33k £41.11k
Total expenditure £33.19k £13.90k £46.05k £44.51k £43.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.00k N/A £1.00k N/A