Trustees WOKINGHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 274853

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katy Lethbridge | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Butler | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Iles | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Smith | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Payler | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Ann Krzyzaniak | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Blake | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dunning | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Jaconello | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fulton | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penelope Ward | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.