THE DOLPHIN PUPPETEERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talks and film shows to adults and children on the making of the series of 13 puppet animation films (Willoughby Drive). Exhibitions of film sets, puppets and photographs. These include the crafted props made for the films. Idea for schools (see www.dolphinpuppetfilms.co.uk).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 February 1978: Standard registration
- 22 May 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £0 | £200 | £700 | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26 | £2 | £169 | £400 | £2.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 21 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 03 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 03 March 2005 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST DECEMBER 1977 AND AMENDED ON THE 3RD MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF PLAYS AND FILMS AT THE REQUEST OF CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ENTERPRISES, BODIES AND INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window