THE MAESTRO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity is currently dormant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 1978: Standard registration
- AUSTRALIAN SINFONIA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE RICHARD FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROBERT LITTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL SARCICH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 March 2022 | 629 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF THE ART OF MUSIC (INCLUDING OPERA, MUSIC, DRAMA, BALLET AND ALL ART FORMS CONSISTING IN WHOLE OR IN PART OF MUSIC) PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 SHAKESPEARE GARDENS
LONDON
N2 9LJ
- Phone:
- 02088837306
- Email:
- music@calarecords.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window