COL-RENO LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance religion in accordance with the Orthodox Jewish faith by the provision of grants and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 21 February 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN HAROLD STERN | Chair | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN EUGENE STERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHAIM ARYE STERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHONA DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LIBBIE GOLDSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.23k | £127.55k | £135.08k | £128.59k | £135.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.40k | £82.35k | £122.58k | £135.16k | £135.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH DECEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 54
Danescroft
Brent Street
LONDON
NW4 2QH
- Phone:
- 02082027013
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window