EUROPEAN-ATLANTIC GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To increase knowledge of international issues and organisations, in particular, by arranging regular meetings where members may discuss the development of the European and Atlantic communites and their relations to the rest of the world, and to disseminate knowledge in the above fields; all of which activities are undertaken for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lewis Isaacs | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN GLASS | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.08k | £1.36k | £867 | £759 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £0 | £39.96k | £95 | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JULY 1954 AND AMENDED 23RD JANUARY 1978, 12TH MARCH 1998 AND 10 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
(A) TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE OF INTERNATIONAL ISSUES AND ORGANIZATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY ARRANGING MEETINGS WHERE MEMBERS MAY DISCUSS THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE EUROPEAN AND ATLANTIC COMMUNITIES AND THEIR RELATIONS TO THE REST OF THE WORLD. (B) TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE IN THE ABOVE FIELDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Berkshire Road
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 1ND
- Phone:
- 01491 577130
- Email:
- d.isaacs873@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window