Financial history THE ARDEN THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 274906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £41.33k £28.08k £5.87k £37.57k £77.85k
Total expenditure £23.32k £10.26k £22.45k £54.36k £46.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £350 £10.00k N/A N/A £11.25k