COMBE BANK PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aim of the Association is to advance the education of pupils at Combe Bank School by assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school and ancillary sports activities. Also, to foster extended relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 17 December 1979: Standard registration
- 11 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.93k | £15.27k | £19.21k | £9.49k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.05k | £10.32k | £13.72k | £27.49k | £969 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 01 July 2018 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 20 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 22 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JANUARY AND AMENDED 23RD OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window