RIVERVIEW PARK SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Riverview Park Scout Group, comprising of One Beaver Colony, Two Cub Packs and One Scout Troup. The Group currently operates from our HQ in Whinfell Way, Gravesend, Kent. The Group is extremely successful in the Gravesham District with each section operating at maximum capacity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 02 February 1978: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 November 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY DAVIS | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CRABTREE | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JO-ANNE DAVIS | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.98k | £22.23k | £17.75k | £21.59k | £23.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £11.40k | £27.18k | £21.92k | £30.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912.
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERVIEW SCOUT HALL
14 Gateway Parade
Whinfell Way
GRAVESEND
DA12 4RU
- Phone:
- 07800586131
- Email:
- sally.moor@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window